Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Beidle, Feldman, Hayes, and Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing, from 0.17% to 0.25%, the maximum that may be charged to certain public service companies for a State fiscal year to reimburse the Public Service Commission for certain costs and expenses.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-33)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted 38
Senate 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 39
House 3/04/2020 3/04/2020 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51A
House 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (100-33) 52
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:37 AM