Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Garrett County Virtual Education Days Pilot Program; authorizing the Garrett County Superintendent to order a virtual education day instead of closing a public school in the event of inclement weather; requiring the county superintendent to notify a public school principal as soon as possible after making a certain decision; requiring the Garrett County Board of Education to submit a report on its use of virtual education days to certain committees of the General Assembly by September 1, 2023; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304434/1
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {304434/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {524030/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Garrett County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {304434/1 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {304434/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {524030/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Garrett County - Public Schools - Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Ways and Means 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
(   7-103.2 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 3:59 PM
Click to return on the top page