Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Sponsored by
Senator West
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Hearing Aid Loan Bank Program in the State Department of Education to be the Hearing Aid and Language and Communication Video Loan Bank Program; requiring the Loan Bank to lend language and communication videos and certain downloadable resources to the parents or legal guardians of deaf or hard of hearing children; exempting the parent or legal guardian of a deaf or hard of hearing child from paying tuition for a course that teaches a language or communication mode at a public institution of higher education; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1384
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {984630/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {676089/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text - First - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments {984630/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 11:00 a.m.
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {676089/1 Adopted 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 742
Text - Chapter - Deaf or Hard of Hearing Individuals - Support for Parents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.10, 8-601 through 8-606 )
(   19-308.5 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM