Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a Class B-D beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Allegany county to issue a Class B-D license for use by a certain restaurant; authorizing a license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor for on-premises consumption; requiring the license holder to submit a certain Food Alcohol Ratio Report to demonstrate compliance with a certain annual gross sales requirement; prohibiting more than two Class B-D licenses from being issued in a single year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0883
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124139/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
4/12/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (118-16)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer and Auction of Licenses
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {124139/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2021 3/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 4/12/2021 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (118-16) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/14/2021 10:10 AM
Click to return on the top page