Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Sponsored by
Senators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Robinson, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date from November 15 to November 1 by which a member of the General Assembly may request the Department of Legislative Services to prepare a bill for prefile at a regular session under certain circumstances; and altering the date from the second Friday after Thanksgiving to the preceding November 20 by which a member may direct the Department to prefile a bill under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-2)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Favorable Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Second Reading Passed 31
Text - Third - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (40-0) 33
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 34
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (133-2) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text - Chapter - General Assembly - Prefiled Bills - Deadlines
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM