Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission and the Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems, in consultation with certain entities, jointly to develop a certain statewide plan, identify a Medicare reimbursement process, study and make recommendations regarding the desirability and feasibility of reimbursement for certain emergency services, and submit certain reports on or before January 1, 2019.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367072/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance - Emergency Medical Services Providers - Coverage and Reimbursement of Services
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {367072/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/23/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Text - Third - Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan
Senate 3/26/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Text - Chapter - Emergency Medical Services Providers – Coverage and Reimbursement of Services – Reports and Plan
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM