Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Garagiola
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an Earned Income Disregard Pilot Program within the Family Investment Program; requiring the Department of Human Resources to select a specified type of county to participate in the Pilot Program; requiring the Department of Human Resources and specified directors of local departments of social services to select and inform participants; specifying eligibility requirements; authorizing the Department to select a rural county to participate in the Pilot Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0884
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954567/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-13)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Senators Garagiola, Glassman, and Klausmeier
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Delegates James, Haynes, and Eckardt
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-13)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Appropriations 46
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {954567/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-13) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senate Requests House Recede 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Senators Garagiola, Glassman, and Klausmeier 63
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Refuses to Recede 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Delegates James, Haynes, and Eckardt 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
House 4/08/2013 4/04/2013 Third Reading Passed (126-13) 68
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Passed Enrolled 68
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-310, 5-310.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM