Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order requiring the cessation of all business operations to certain employers for certain violations of certain wage and hour laws or workplace fraud laws; providing that a certain stop work order takes effect when served and remains in effect until the Commissioner issues an order releasing the stop work order; requiring the Commissioner to issue an order releasing a certain stop work order on a certain showing by the employer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1371
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Construction Services - Stop Work Orders
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/26/2020 2:57 PM