Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Elfreth, Hough, Smith, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the elements of the prohibitions against human trafficking and renaming them sex trafficking; prohibiting a person from knowingly taking another for prostitution by use of or intent to use force, threat, coercion, or fraud; prohibiting a person from knowingly engaging in certain conduct with the intent to compel another to marry any person under certain circumstances; classifying the offense of human trafficking as a crime of violence under certain provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {382210/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Judiciary 46A
House 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {382210/1 Adopted 56
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 22
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402, 10-406, 3-8A-19, 4-301 )
(   11-301, 11-303, 11-305, 11-306, 11-307, 14-101, 3-1101, 3-1102, 3-1103, 3-324, 9-801 )
(   10-110, 10-301, 11-701, 13-501, 13-502, 13-503, 13-507, 13-508, 13-514, 13-518, 13-522, 13-524, 13-525, 13-528, 8-302 )
(   2-412, 5-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM