Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a certain worldwide headquartered company, if the company's parent corporation is a franchisor, to employ at the parent corporation's principal executive office in the State at least 400 full-time employees at all times between July 1, 2017, and June 30, 2020, in order to elect to use a certain formula to apportion certain income to the State for purposes of the income tax on corporations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1022 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Single Sales Factor Apportionment Exemption - Worldwide Headquartered Company Election
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 12:59 PM