Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a certain exemption from certain insurance laws for certain voluntary noncontractual religious publication arrangements; exempting from certain insurance laws certain health care sharing ministries; requiring a person to obtain a certificate of registration from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to act as a health care sharing ministry in the State; requiring the Commissioner to send a notice of an impending expiration of a certificate of registration not later than 30 days before the expiration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0994
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-202, 27-402, 8-701 through 8-707 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:16 PM