Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Klausmeier, and West
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition against a community care retirement community provider, subscriber, or group of subscribers being represented by counsel during a certain mediation procedure.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0588
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/25/2019 3/25/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 64
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 244
Text - Chapter - Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Mediation - Representation by Counsel
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-428 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM