Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Sponsored by
Senators Rosapepe, Benson, Madaleno, Manno, Ramirez, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a contractor or subcontractor awarded a specified contract for a specified construction project that receives specified funding from the State capital budget to be affiliated with, and to use apprentices from, an apprenticeship program that is registered with the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation or the United States Department of Labor, or requiring the contractor or subcontractor to make specified payments to the State Apprenticeship Training Fund or to specified apprenticeship programs; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0467
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0457 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937074/1
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937074/1
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {937074/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {263326/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {153620/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {113725/2 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Text - First - Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937074/1 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937074/1 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable with Amendments {937074/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {263326/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (17-27) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {153620/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Floor Amendment {113725/2 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship Act
Senate 4/03/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/07/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 70 Click to view Recorded Media
(   17-602, 17-6A-01 through 17-6A-06 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page