Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to accept a certain form of security from a transportation network company in place of a certain insurance policy if the other form of security adequately provides certain benefits and if the transportation network company is an affiliate of a company that provides taxicab services and has no fewer than 26 nor more than 300 operators; requiring transportation network companies to provide evidence of certain security to the Public Service Commission under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1072
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {837474/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403393/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments {837474/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Referred Economic Matters 45
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {403393/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Transportation Network Companies - Insurance
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM