Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Augustine, Guzzone, Peters, and Rosapepe
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain insurers, based solely on the status of an applicant or individual status as an organ donor, from taking certain actions relating to certain insurance policies; prohibiting certain insurers from prohibiting an applicant or individual from donating an organ as a condition of insurance; providing that certain employees are entitled to a certain number of business days of unpaid organ donation leave in a 12-month period under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1284
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019, January 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {377879/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Organ Donation – Prohibition on Discrimination by Insurer and Unpaid Leave
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46A
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters 46A
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-1) 68
Senate 4/08/2019 4/03/2019 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-501 )
(   3-103, 3-1401 through 3-1409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM