Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Lee, Benson, Brochin, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from transporting a certain rapid fire trigger activator into the State or manufacturing, possessing, selling, offering to sell, transferring, purchasing, or receiving a certain rapid fire trigger activator, subject to a certain exception; defining "rapid fire trigger activator" as any device, including a removable manual or power-driven activating device, constructed so that, when installed in or attached to a firearm the rate at which the trigger is activated increases or the rate of fire increases; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0888
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018, October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {643520/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {303023/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {883329/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {233624/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {593129/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-28)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (36-11)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {773023/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-91)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-29)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {498175/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {643520/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (16-28) 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {883329/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (19-25) 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {303023/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected (17-28) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {883329/2 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-29) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {233624/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (17-28) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {593129/2 (Senator Salling) Rejected (15-28) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (36-11) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Floor Amendment {773023/1 (Delegate Mautz) Rejected (42-91) 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (111-29) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text - Chapter - Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger Activator
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-301, 4-305.1, 4-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM