Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Voting by Absentee Ballot - Prepaid Postage for the Return of Ballots
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified required envelopes used by specified voters voting by absentee ballot to return their ballots include prepaid postage; requiring the State Board of Elections to reimburse counties for the costs of prepaid postage for the absentee ballot envelopes used by specified voters for absentee voting; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {275467/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-19)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/11/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {275467/1 Report Adopted 66
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (118-19) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-310 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM