Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Household Goods Movers Registration
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Feldman, and Klausmeier
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services using a certain commercial motor vehicle in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; establishing certain requirements and procedures for the registration of household goods movers under the Act; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0671
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/05 (Delegate Saab) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-39)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Household Goods Movers Registration
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Household Goods Movers Registration
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - Household Goods Movers Registration
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Motion Special Order until 04/05 (Delegate Saab) Adopted 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-39) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text - Chapter - Household Goods Movers Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8.5-101 through 8.5-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM