Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsored by
Senators Carozza, Hershey, and Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who is at least 13 years old, a corporation, a partnership, an association, a nonprofit entity, the State, or any unit or political subdivision of the State from knowingly and intentionally releasing, or causing to be released, a balloon into the atmosphere; prohibiting a person from organizing or participating in a mass balloon release; requiring a person who violates the Act to perform 6 hours of community service or watch a video on environmental damage or both; establishing a $100 civil penalty; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0391
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0013 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/31/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214730/1
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214730/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Senator Jennings)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (20-25)
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {133220/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
4/08/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-33)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/31/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments {214730/1 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Carter) Adopted 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Favorable with Amendments {214730/1 Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Senator Jennings) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Floor Amendment {583828/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (20-25) 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Floor Amendment {133220/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2021 3/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Senate 4/02/2021 3/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Hearing 4/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2021 4/08/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2021 3/23/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-33) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Text - Chapter - Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
(   9-2301 )
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page