Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Sponsored by
Senators Griffith, Benson, Carter, Elfreth, Ellis, Guzzone, Hayes, Kagan, Kelley, Lee, McCray, Washington, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without qualifying children to claim an increased credit; allowing certain individuals to claim a refund of the credit; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0680
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0262 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Earned Income Tax Credit - Individuals Without Qualifying Children - Calculation and Refundability
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 12:26 PM