Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program (The Thomas Bloom Raskin Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Feldman, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, Ready, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in consultation with 2-1-1 Maryland, to make certain recommendations relating to the establishment of an opt-in mental health services phone call program that would require a center to call individuals who have opted into the mental health services phone call program on a periodic basis and attempt to connect individuals to a provider of mental health services under certain circumstances; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation to carry out the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0812
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817879/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953222/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2021
Legislative Date
3/12/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Department of Health - 2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Favorable with Amendments {817879/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Floor Amendment {953222/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health - 2-1-1 Maryland - Mental Health Services Phone Call Program
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/25/2021 3/12/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Returned Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:21 PM
Click to return on the top page