Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Smith, and Hough
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing an exception to motor vehicle registration requirements for personal delivery devices; authorizing a personal delivery device to operate on any roadway, sidewalk, shoulder, footpath, bicycle trail, or crosswalk in the State; creating certain marking, equipment, and insurance requirements for personal delivery devices being operated on roadways, sidewalks, shoulders, or crosswalks; requiring an operator of a personal delivery device to comply with certain local laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0595
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0874 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448070/1
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {448070/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {423726/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {430214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/26/2021 2/26/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {448070/1 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kagan) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {448070/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Floor Amendment {423726/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable with Amendments {430214/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 3/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/22/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page