Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Purchase of Cybersecurity Technology or Service
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition under the State income tax credit for the purchase of cybersecurity technology or services to repeal a prohibition on a qualified buyer having 50 or more employees; applying the Act to all tax credit certificates issued after June 30, 2019; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Purchase of Cybersecurity Technology or Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Purchase of Cybersecurity Technology or Service
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Purchase of Cybersecurity Technology or Service
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Purchase of Cybersecurity Technology or Service
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Ways and Means 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-733.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page