Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0728


CH0378

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Administration of Anesthesia
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to establish through regulations a provision requiring an ambulatory surgical facility to ensure that an anesthesia practitioner is not precluded from providing the highest level of anesthesia support that may be required to safely treat patients undergoing procedures in a freestanding ambulatory surgical facility performed in a nonsterile procedure room or a sterile operating room.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0935
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {817770/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities - Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Administration of Anesthesia
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Favorable with Amendments {817770/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Freestanding Ambulatory Care Facilities - Administration of Anesthesia
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 49
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 51A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Returned Passed 53C
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 378
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:16 PM