Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring employers with 10 or more employees, or whose rate of work-related injury and illness exceeds the average incidence rate of all industries in the State to develop and implement a health and safety committee to promote health and safety in the workplace; providing for the membership, meetings, and duties of the committee; requiring that the committee maintain certain records and retain the records for a certain period of time; requiring each employer to establish and maintain an injury and illness prevention program; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Worker Safety and Health - Injury and Illness Prevention Program
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   5-1301 through 5-1305 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:21 PM
Click to return on the top page