Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a county board of education to extend the length of the school year for up to 5 school days beyond June 15 without approval from the State Board of Education; and requiring a county board to submit a written application to the State Board for permission to increase the length of the school year for more than a certain number of school days in accordance with a certain provision of law or to decrease the length of the school year.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0553
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384530/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {965062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/10/2018
Legislative Date
4/10/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {384530/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Text - Third - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {965062/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 55
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Post Passage 4/10/2018 4/10/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text - Chapter - County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM