Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Elfreth, Feldman, Lam, Lee, Patterson, Peters, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology, in consultation with the Departments of Natural Resources, the Environment, Planning, and Agriculture and the Chesapeake Bay Program to conduct a technical study to review changes in forest cover and tree canopy in the State; providing for the scope of the study; and requiring the Harry R. Hughes Center for Agro-Ecology to submit a report of the findings of the technical study to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2019.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0735
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Forest Conservation in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544231/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670518/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-26)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Task Force on Forest Conservation in Maryland
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {544231/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 50
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable with Amendments {670518/1 Adopted 54
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Third Reading Passed (112-26) 55
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Text - Chapter - Technical Study on Changes in Forest Cover and Tree Canopy in Maryland
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM