Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Lee, Ramirez, Ready, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before October 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Task Force on Organized Retail Crime Rings
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM