Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Beidle, Elfreth, Feldman, Guzzone, Kramer, Patterson, and Peters
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the sale of a certain rifle or shotgun, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain sale is conducted, the seller and purchaser to meet jointly with a certain licensee and request that the licensee facilitate the sale; requiring a licensee to take certain actions when facilitating a sale; exempting a certain person from a certain background check under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0786
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {748674/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {773526/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {593529/1 (Senator Bailey) Withdrawn
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-30)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {333823/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Transactions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {748674/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {773526/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {593529/1 (Senator Bailey) Withdrawn 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {173428/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-30) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {273520/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-30) 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {333823/3 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Text - Third - Public Safety – Rifles and Shotguns – Sales, Rentals, Transfers, and Loans
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-201, 5-204.1, 5-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM