Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a peer-to-peer car sharing program from delivering or issuing in the State a peer-to-peer car sharing program agreement containing a collision damage waiver, unless the peer-to-peer car sharing program uses a certain collision damage waiver form; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license authorizing the sale of certain insurance by the peer-to-peer car sharing program; providing that a peer-to-peer car sharing program is subject to a certain sales and use tax rate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1045
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018, January 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617978/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {317479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423193/1 Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (120-9)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-21)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {617978/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Floor Committee Amendment {317479/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Text - Third - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments {423193/1 Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (120-9) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (116-21) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852
Text - Chapter - Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing Programs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-2101 )
(   10-601, 10-6A-01 through 10-6A-07, 19-512, 19-520 )
(   11-101, 11-104 )
(   18.5-101 through 18.5-110, 18-101, 18-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM