Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Eckardt, Edwards, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hershey, Hester, Jennings, King, Lam, Lee, Rosapepe, West, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland to develop a comprehensive siting blueprint to guide units of State and local government in evaluating proposed solar energy projects, consistent with the Commission's findings and recommendations; requiring the Commission to take certain actions in carrying out its work; requiring the Commission to submit a certain report and blueprint to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2020; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0532
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444335/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444335/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/09/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {444335/1 40
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Feldman) Adopted 40
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments {444335/1 Adopted 41
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 44
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM