Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

SB0749


CH0628

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Correcting certain errors or omissions in certain articles of the Annotated Code and in certain uncodified laws; clarifying language; correcting certain obsolete references; reorganizing certain sections of the Annotated Code; ratifying certain corrections made by the publishers of the Annotated Code; providing that the Act is not intended to affect any law other than to correct technical errors; providing for the correction of certain errors and obsolete provisions by the publishers of the Annotated Code; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2020
Legislative Date
2/19/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Favorable Adopted 29
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Second Reading Passed 29
Text - Third - Annual Corrective Bill
Senate 2/19/2020 2/19/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 31
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 32
House 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Hearing 3/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47B
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 48
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:36 PM