Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Senator King) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain appointing authorities from delegating the authority to make the final decision on the appointment or termination of certain employees; requiring the Appointments Office, by December 31, 2019, and each December 31 thereafter, to submit a report to the Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight on the Office's activities regarding employees under the jurisdiction of an appointing authority; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to provide a certain hotline or e-mail address for certain purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {687678/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {687678/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-25)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (26-17)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-32)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2020
Legislative Date
1/22/2020
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Senator King) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Governor’s Appointments Office and the Secretary of Budget and Management – At–Will Employees – Duties and Reports
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {687678/1 55
Senate 3/27/2019 3/23/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Serafini) Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {687678/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Text - Third - Governor’s Appointments Office, Appointing Authorities, and the Secretary of Budget and Management – Duties and Reports
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-25) 57
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (26-17) 57
House 4/01/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 57
House 4/01/2019 4/02/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (105-32) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/22 (Senator King) Adopted
Senate 1/22/2020 1/22/2020 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/30 (Senator King) Adopted
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM