Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; establishing a Restaurant Meals Program (RMP) within the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to expand food access to certain individuals; providing that a certain household is eligible to participate in the RMP if the household is eligible for certain State and federal benefits and lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime residence and includes certain persons; requiring a restaurant to meet certain requirements to participate; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0838
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {177077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-35)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/24/2019
Legislative Date
5/24/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable with Amendments {177077/1 Adopted 49
Senate 3/19/2019 3/17/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program
Senate 3/20/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 50
House 3/21/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 51A
House 3/26/2019 3/27/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (105-35) 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
Senate 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Veto sustained (0-46)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-501, 5-503, 5-504, 5-505 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM