Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Griffith, King, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program to provide strategic investment in local housing and businesses with a focus on areas where modest investment will have an appreciable neighborhood revitalization impact; establishing the type of community enhancement projects eligible to receive Program funds; authorizing certain government agencies, including housing authorities, and certain community development organizations to apply to receive Program funds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {204834/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {103124/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {333629/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {263326/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Text - First - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {204834/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {103124/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Floor Amendment {333629/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Floor Amendment {263326/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Text - Third - National Capital Strategic Economic Development Program - Established
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Rereferred to Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-510, 6-701 through 6-709, 6-710 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM