Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel Management System - Office of the Public Defender - Placement
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, within the Office of the Public Defender, the deputy public defender, district public defenders, assistant public defenders, and other employees are placed in certain employment categories in the State Personnel Management System; authorizing the Public Defender to employ, rather than appoint, assistant public defenders and other employees; authorizing assistant public defenders and other employees to be terminated or disciplined only for cause in accordance with certain provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Reassigned to Finance 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - State Personnel Management System - Office of the Public Defender - Placement
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:21 PM
Click to return on the top page