Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for the total installed costs paid or incurred by a taxpayer that installs an energy storage system and who obtains a tax credit certificate from the Maryland Energy Administration; requiring the Administration to issue tax credits not to exceed specified amounts; prohibiting the Administration from issuing an aggregate amount of tax credit certificates exceeding $750,000 in a taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0490
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0834 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2017
Legislative Date
2/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {873227/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {945260/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {883825/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-11)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/24/2017 2/24/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable 38
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 38
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hershey) Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {873227/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Ways and Means 43
House 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {945260/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {883825/1 (Delegate Reznik) Adopted 68
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-11) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 389
Text - Chapter - Income Tax Credit - Energy Storage Systems
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-719 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM