Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish a meal charge policy that addresses payment for meals, unpaid meal debt, prohibition of stigmatizing actions, and other issues related to the administration of school meal programs and management of payments for school meals; requiring the State Department of Education to create and maintain a database of the county board meal charge policies, publish the policies on its website, and report to the General Assembly on certain matters by December 1, 2020 and 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1173
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/19/2020 4:57 PM