Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish a meal charge policy addressing payment for meals, unpaid meal debt, prohibition of stigmatizing actions, and other issues related to the school meal programs and management of payments for school meals; providing the Act does not apply to a county that has adopted the Community Eligibility Provision of the federal Healthy, Hunger-Free Kids Act of 2010 districtwide; requiring the Department to publish the meal charge policy and to report to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1173
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224234/1
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {224234/1
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable as Amended Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
42A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (131-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable with Amendments {224234/1 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Committee Amendment Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable as Amended Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 40
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Meal Programs and Meal Charge Policies
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 42
House 3/06/2020 3/05/2020 Referred Ways and Means 42A
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Favorable with Amendments {925162/1 Adopted 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Washington) Adopted (131-0) 49A
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 49A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Senate Concurs House Amendments 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 51A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/12/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Schools – Student Meal Programs and Policies
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:19 AM