Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Lee, Manno, and Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements for the form and content of specified livestock production contracts; establishing that contract producers have specified rights; prohibiting specified contractors from engaging in or allowing their employees or agents to engage in specified practices; establishing specified civil and criminal penalties for violation of the Act; providing for enforcement of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Farmers' Rights Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-101 through 24-902 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM