Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, DeGrange, Kasemeyer, King, and Miller
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to declare an amnesty period for delinquent taxpayers from September 1, 2015, through October 30, 2015, for civil penalties and half the interest attributable to nonpayment, nonreporting, or underreporting of specified taxes under specified circumstances; authorizing the Comptroller to enter into agreements to provide a specified waiver under specified circumstances; providing that the amnesty program does not apply to specified taxpayers under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1233
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {389231/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {675466/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2015 2/19/2015 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {389231/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {675466/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM