Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Department of Health – Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists – Workgroup and Report
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to convene a stakeholder workgroup to make findings and recommendations on issues related to the reimbursement of certified peer recovery specialists; requiring the workgroup to include representatives of certain persons; and requiring the Secretary to submit a report on the findings and recommendations of the workgroup to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0772
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {477279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Clinical Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {477279/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Maryland Department of Health – Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists – Workgroup and Report
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 61A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 324
Text - Chapter - Maryland Department of Health – Reimbursement for Services Provided by Certified Peer Recovery Specialists – Workgroup and Report
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM