Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to provide technical assistance and training to county boards of education regarding the use of restorative approaches under certain circumstances; requiring certain regulations adopted by a county board to incorporate the use of restorative approaches and to state that the primary purpose of any disciplinary measure is rehabilitative, restorative, and educational; requiring that a student discipline data report be submitted to the Governor and the General Assembly by October 1 each year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0725
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624431/1
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {624431/1
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (20-24)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {624431/1 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Motion Special Order until 4/5 (Senator Lam) Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments {624431/1 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Motion Re-referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (20-24) 62A
Text - Third - Public Schools - Student Discipline - Restorative Approaches
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 63
House 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM