Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Ethics Law - Statement by Person Providing Lobbyist Compensation and Making Campaign Contributions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying and conforming specified provisions of the State ethics law with related provisions under the State election law relating to a statement required by persons providing lobbyist compensation and making campaign contributions; altering the reporting periods and due dates for a specified statement; authorizing the State Board of Elections to impose fines for the late filing of a specified statement; altering a specified definition; and defining a term.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {274431/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {195066/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {274431/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {195066/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM