Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering, from 20% to 25%, the percentage of an expert's professional activities that may have been devoted to certain activities that directly involve testimony in personal injury claims during the 12 months immediately before the date when the claim was first filed in order for the expert to qualify to testify in relation to a certain proceeding; establishing that a certain health care provider shall be deemed to have met a certain requirement during the pendency of a claim under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {338570/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-3)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {338570/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-3) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Text - Chapter - Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Qualification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM