Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require each chamber of the General Assembly to designate its highest elected member within each party to appoint their party's members to standing committees in a manner that reflects the diversity of each House; and submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State of Maryland for their adoption or rejection.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Committee Testimony
Details
Constitutional Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
3/04/2021
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Constitutional Amendment - General Assembly - Standing Committee Appointments
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 10:30 a.m.
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2021 3/04/2021 Hearing 3/05 at 11:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Rules Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page