Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
Sponsored by
Senators Smith, Carter, Hester, Lee, McCray, Nathan-Pulliam, Waldstreicher, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the entities required to submit a certain report relating to restrictive housing; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to submit certain information from each correctional unit in a report to the General Assembly; prohibiting a correctional unit from placing a minor in restrictive housing unless there is clear and convincing evidence that certain conditions exist; requiring that a minor in restrictive housing be provided certain conditions and privileges; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {188677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562013/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (126-11)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Washington and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Washington and Waldstreicher)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis and Malone)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Refuses Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis and Malone)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {713129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Conference Committee Report {713129/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-17)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/01/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {188677/1 Adopted 47A
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Judiciary 50
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {562013/1 Adopted 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (126-11) 60
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 62A
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Washington and Waldstreicher) 62A
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Requests House Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Hough, Washington and Waldstreicher) 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Refuses Recede 65
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis and Malone) 65
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Refuses Recede 63
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Moon, D.M. Davis and Malone) 63
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {713129/1 Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 64
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Conference Committee Report {713129/1 Adopted 67
House 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Third Reading Passed (121-17) 67
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text - Chapter - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Reporting by Correctional Units and Requirements Relating to Minors
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-614, 9-614.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM