Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "taxpayer" as the owner of residential or commercial property who purchases and installs an energy storage system or an individual that owns or pays for the installation of an energy storage system that supplies energy for use on a residential or commercial property; providing a credit against the State income tax for the costs of installing an energy storage system; increasing from $75,000 to $150,000 the maximum tax credit certificate that may be issued for the installation of an energy storage system on certain property; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0980
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Energy Storage Tax Credit – Alterations
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2020 11:29 AM