Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Ceding Insurers and Reinsurance
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a domestic ceding insurer be allowed credit for reinsurance in specified manners under specified circumstances; providing for specified credit to be allowed under specified circumstances depending on the licensure or authorization status and accreditation status of the assuming insurer; establishing requirements and procedures for an assuming reinsurer to be accredited by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {477976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {477976/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 55A
House 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901 through 5-904, 5-903, 5-905, 5-906 through 5-916 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM