Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Patient Early Intervention Programs
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a statement made by a party during a discussion held in accordance with a patient safety early intervention program is inadmissible in specified legal proceedings; authorizing a hospital or a related institution to establish a specified patient safety early intervention program; establishing specified requirements for a patient safety early intervention program; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0777
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Patient Early Intervention Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2017
Legislative Date
2/23/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488676/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488676/1
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Patient Early Intervention Programs
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2017 2/23/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {488676/1 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {488676/1 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-304.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM